No. 17-951
Title:Vitol S.A., et al., Petitioners
v.
Autoridad de Energia Electrica de Puerto Rico
Docketed:January 4, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the First Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1438, 16-1447)
   Decision Date:June 13, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 2, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 02 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 5, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Waiver of right of respondent Autoridad de Energia Electrica de Puerto Rico, et al. to respond filed.
Feb 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 12 2018Response Requested. (Due March 14, 2018)
Feb 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 14, 2018 to April 13, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 13, 2018.
Apr 13 2018Brief of respondent Autoridad de Energia Electrica de Puerto Rico in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gregory George Garre
    Counsel of Record
Latham & Watkins LLP
555 11th Street, NW
Suite 1000
Washington, DC 20004

gregory.garre@lw.com
202-637-2207
Party name: Vitol S.A., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Eduardo J. Corretjer Reyes
    Counsel of Record
Corretjer, L.L.C.
625 Ave. Ponce de Leon
San Juan, PR 00917-4819

ejcr@corretjerlaw.com
1-787-751-4618
Party name: Autoridad de Energia Electrica de Puerto Rico
Eduardo J. Corretjer Reyes
    Counsel of Record
Corretjer, L.L.C.
625 Ponce de Leon Ave.
San Juan, PR 00917-4819

ejcr@corretjerlaw.com
(787) 751-4618
Party name: Autoridad de Energia Electrica de Puerto Rico, et al.