No. 17-950
Title:Ross William Ulbricht, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 4, 2018
Linked with 17A559
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1815-cr)
   Decision Date:May 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 30, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 16 2017Application (17A559) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 28, 2017 to December 28, 2017, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Nov 20 2017Application (17A559) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until December 28, 2017.
Dec 22 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 5, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 09 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Ross William Ulbricht.
Blanket Consent
Jan 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 5, 2018 to March 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 31 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 7, 2018.
Feb 05 2018Brief amici curiae of National Lawyers Guild, et al filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Black Cross filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2018Brief amici curiae of Reason Foundation,et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2018Brief amici curiae of Drug Policy Alliance, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 05 2018Brief amici curiae of Downsize DC Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Mar 21 2018Reply of petitioner Ross William Ulbricht filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

kshanmugam@wc.com
(202) 434-5000
Party name: Ross William Ulbricht
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Bradley Alan Benbrook
    Counsel of Record
Benbrook Law Group
400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2530
Sacramento, CA 95814

brad@benbrooklawgroup.com
9164474900
Party name: Reason Foundation,et al.
Heidi Elizabeth Boghosian
    Counsel of Record
A.J. Muste Memorial Institute, Inc.
168 Canal Street, 6th Fl.
New York, NY 10013

heidiboghosian@gmail.com
917-239-4999
Party name: National Lawyers Guild, et al
Alan Gura
    Counsel of Record
Gura PLLC
916 Prince Street
Suite 107
Alexandria, VA 22314

alan@gurapllc.com
703-835-9085
Party name: American Black Cross
Anna-Rose Mathieson
    Counsel of Record
California Appellate Law Group LLP
96 Jessie Street
San Francisco, CA 94105

Annarose@calapplaw.com
415-649-6700
Party name: Drug Policy Alliance, et al.
Robert Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

rob@wjopc.com
703-356-5070
Party name: Downsize DC Foundation, et al.