No. 17-95
Title:S. S., et al., Petitioners
v.
Colorado River Indian Tribes, et al.
Docketed:July 19, 2017
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Arizona, Division One
   Case Numbers:(1 CA-JV 16-0163)
   Decision Date:January 12, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:April 18, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 17 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 18, 2017)
Jul 27 2017Blanket consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs filed by petitioners, S. S., et al.
Aug 02 2017Consent to the filing of amicus briefs received from counsel for Colorado River Indian Tribes submitted.
Aug 07 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 18, 2017.
Aug 18 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Pacific Legal Foundation.
Sep 18 2017Brief of respondents Colorado River Indian Tribes, et al. in opposition filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

litigation@goldwaterinstitute.org
(602) 462-5000
Party name: S. S., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Adam Howard Charnes
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick Townsend
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 4400
Dallas, TX 75201

acharnes@kilpatricktownsend.com
214-922-7100
Party name: Colorado River Indian Tribes, et al.
Other
Joshua Paul Thompson
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

jthompson@pacificlegal.org
(916)-419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation