No. 17-942
Title:R. K. B., et al., Petitioners
v.
E. T.
Docketed:January 3, 2018
Linked with 17A562
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Utah
   Case Numbers:(20150434)
   Decision Date:August 31, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 17 2017Application (17A562) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 29, 2017 to December 29, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceLower Court Orders/Opinions
Nov 20 2017Response to application from respondent E.T. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Nov 22 2017Application (17A562) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until December 29, 2017.
Dec 18 2017Application (17A562) to extend further the time from December 29, 2017 to January 16, 2018, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Written RequestProof of Service
Dec 21 2017Application (17A562) denied by Justice Sotomayor.
Dec 29 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 2, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 2, 2018 to February 16, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 16, 2018
Jan 23 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, R. K. B., et al..
Blanket Consent
Feb 01 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Council For Adoption filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 02 2018Brief amici curiae of Academy of Adoption and Assisted Reproduction Attorneys filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of Utah Adoption Council filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of Goldwater Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 16 2018Brief of E.T. in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Gene Clayton Schaerr
    Counsel of Record
Schaerr | Duncan
1717 K Street NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20006

gschaerr@schaerr-duncan.com
202-787-1060
Party name: R. K. B., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Adam Howard Charnes
    Counsel of Record
Kilpatrick Townsend
2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 4400
Dallas, TX 75201

acharnes@kilpatricktownsend.com
214-922-7106
Party name: E.T.
Other
Mary Margaret Wehrheim Beck
    Counsel of Record
University of MO School of Law, Beck Attorney
226 Hulston Hall
University of MO School of Law
Columbia, MO 65211

beckm@missouri.edu
573-882-7274
Party name: Academy of Adoption and Assisted Reproduction Attorneys
William C. Duncan
    Counsel of Record
1868 N 800 E
Lehi, UT 84043

billduncan56@gmail.com
(801)-367-4570
Party name: National Council For Adoption
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute Scharf-Norton Center for Constitutional Litigation
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

tsandefur@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Goldwater Institute
Robert Scott Young
    Counsel of Record
Snow, Christensen, & Martineau
10 Exchange Place
11th Floor
Salt Lake City, UT 84111

sy@scmlaw.com
801-322-9123
Party name: Utah Adoption Council