No. 17-938
Title:City of Cibolo, Texas, Petitioner
v.
Green Valley Special Utility District
Docketed:January 2, 2018
Linked with 17A420
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-51282)
   Decision Date:August 2, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 16 2017Application (17A420) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 31, 2017 to December 29, 2017, submitted to Justice Alito.
Oct 17 2017Application (17A420) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until December 29, 2017.
Dec 29 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 1, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2018Waiver of right of respondent Green Valley Special Utility District to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 29 2018Brief amici curiae of Texas Municipal League, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 31 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 08 2018Response Requested. (Due March 12, 2018)
Feb 28 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 12, 2018 to March 27, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 27, 2018.
Mar 12 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Guadalupe Valley Development Corporation, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 11, 2018.
Mar 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 27, 2018 to April 11, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 11 2018Brief of respondent Green Valley Special Utility District in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 01 2018Reply of petitioner City of Cibolo, Texas filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 21 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David C. Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick
1615 M Street, NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036-3209

dfrederick@kellogghansen.com
(202) 326-7900
Party name: City of Cibolo, Texas
Attorneys for Respondent
Paul M. Terrill III
    Counsel of Record
Terrill & Waldrop
810 West 10th Street
Austin, TX 78701

pterrill@terrillwaldrop.com
(512) 474-9100
Party name: Green Valley Special Utility District
Other
Melanie Lynn Fry
    Counsel of Record
Dykema Gossett PLLC
112 E.Pecan St., Suite 1800
San Antonio, TX 78205

mfry@dykema.com
2105545500
Party name: Guadalupe Valley Development Corporation, et al.
Heather Mahurin Lockhart
    Counsel of Record
Texas Municipal League
1821 Rutherford Lane, Suite 400
Austin, TX 78754

heather@tml.org
512-231-7400
Party name: Texas Municipal League, et al.