No. 17-936
Title:Gilead Sciences, Inc., Petitioner
v.
United States, ex rel. Jeffrey Campie, et al.
Docketed:January 3, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-16380)
   Decision Date:July 7, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:September 27, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 26 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 2, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Blanket Consent filed by counsel for both Petitioner, Gilead Sciences, Inc. and Respondents Jeffrey Campie and Sherilyn Campie.
Blanket Consent
Jan 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 2, 2018 to March 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 5, 2018.
Feb 01 2018Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce for the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of Coalition for Government Procurement filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of ConocoPhillips Company filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2018Brief amici curiae of Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America; Biotechnology Innovation Organization filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of CTIA - The Wireless Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Mar 05 2018Brief of respondents Jeffrey Campie, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2018Reply of petitioner Gilead Sciences, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Nov 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States of America filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
212-506-5380
Party name: Gilead Sciences, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russel, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Ave., Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tsingh@goldsteinrussell.com
(202) 362-0636
Party name: Jeffrey Campie, et al.
Other
John Patrick Elwood
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins, LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Suite 500 - West
Washington, DC 20037

jelwood@velaw.com
2026396518
Party name: Chamber of Commerce for the United States of America, et al.
Russell Harris Falconer
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2100 McKinney Ave, Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75201

rfalconer@gibsondunn.com
2148035487
Party name: CTIA--the Wireless Association
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
202-508-4776
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America; Biotechnology Innovation Organization
Dan Himmelfarb
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

dhimmelfarb@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3035
Party name: Coalition for Government Procurement
Daryl Langdon Joseffer
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20006

djoseffer@kslaw.com
202-626-5524
Party name: ConocoPhillips Company
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000

rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation