No. 17-935
Title:Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma, et al., Petitioners
v.
Larry Jegley, et al.
Docketed:January 2, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-2234)
   Decision Date:July 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:September 27, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 1, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2018Waiver of right of respondents Larry Jegley, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Feb 01 2018Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law Professors, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2018Brief amici curiae of American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists and American Public Health Association filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 08 2018Response Requested. (Due March 12, 2018)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Carrie Y. Flaxman
    Counsel of Record
Planned Parenthood Federation of America
1110 Vermont Ave., NW
Suite 300
Washington, DC 20005

carrie.flaxman@ppfa.org
2029734830
Party name: Planned Parenthood of Arkansas & Eastern Oklahoma, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
    Counsel of Record
Arkansas Attorney General's Office
323 Center Street, Suite 200
Little Rock, AR 72201

nicholas.bronni@arkansasag.gov
5016826302
Party name: Larry Jegley, et al.
Other
Alan Evan Schoenfeld
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale and Dorr, LLP
7 World Trade Center, 250 World Trade Center
New York, NY 10007

alan.schoenfeld@wilmerhale.com
(212)-937-7294
Party name: Constitutional Law Professors, et al.
Shannon Rose Selden
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
919 3rd Avenue
New York City, NY 10022

srselden@debevoise.com
212-909-6000
Party name: American College of Obstetricians and Gynecologists and American Public Health Association