No. 17-913
Title:D.T ., Petitioner
v.
W. G.
Docketed:December 27, 2017
Linked with 17A463
Lower Ct:Court of Civil Appeals of Alabama
   Case Numbers:(2160082)
   Decision Date:April 21, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:August 25, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 20 2017Application (17A463) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 23, 2017 to December 26, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Oct 31 2017Application (17A463) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 26, 2017.
Dec 26 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 26, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 26, 2018 to February 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 26, 2018.
Jan 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Adoption Scholars and Organizations filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Pamela Susan Karlan
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

karlan@stanford.edu
650-725-4851
Party name: D. T.
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mkimberly@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3127
Party name: W.G.
Other
Andrew H. Schapiro
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
191 N. Wacker Drive
Suite 2700
Chicago, IL 60606

andrewschapiro@quinnemanuel.com
312-705-7400
Party name: Adoption Scholars and Organizations