No. 17-9127
Title:Michael Herrold, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 29, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-11317)
   Decision Date:February 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 28, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service
Jun 05 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jun 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Dec 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
James Matthew Wright
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
500 S. Taylor
Suite 110
Amarillo, TX 79109

matthew_wright@fd.org
8063242370
Party name: Michael Herrold
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States