No. 17-9082
Title:Joshua John Hester and Marco Manuel Luis, Petitioners
v.
United States
Docketed:May 25, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-50107, 16-50123)
   Decision Date:January 4, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:February 27, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 21 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 25, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Jun 04 2018Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jul 13 2018Response Requested. (Due August 13, 2018)
Aug 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 13, 2018 to September 12, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including September 12, 2018.
Sep 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from September 12, 2018 to October 12, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Sep 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including October 12, 2018.
Oct 12 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 17 2018Reply of petitioners Marco Luis, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 25 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Nov 06 2018Rescheduled.
Nov 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018.
Nov 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Dec 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Todd W. Burns
    Counsel of Record
Burns and Cohan
1350 Columbia St.
Suite 600
San Diego, CA 92101

todd@burnsandcohan.com
619-236-0244
Party name: Marco Luis, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States