No. 17-904
Title:Loudoun County, Virginia, Petitioner
v.
Dulles Duty Free, LLC
Docketed:December 26, 2017
Linked with 17A408
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Virginia
   Case Numbers:(160939)
   Decision Date:August 24, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 13 2017Application (17A408) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 22, 2017 to December 22, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Oct 17 2017Application (17A408) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until December 22, 2017.
Dec 19 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 25, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 29 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 25, 2018 to February 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Jan 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 26, 2018.
Jan 24 2018Brief amicus curiae of International Municipal Lawyers Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 25 2018Brief amici curiae of Tax Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Scott E. Gant
    Counsel of Record
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
1401 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

sgant@bsfllp.com
(202) 237-2727
Party name: County of Loudoun, Virginia
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew Allen Fitzgerald
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
Gateway Plaza
800 East Canal Street
Richmond, VA 23219

mfitzgerald@mcguirewoods.com
(804)775-4716
Party name: Dulles Duty Free, LLC
Other
Jeffrey Alexander Love
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel and Frederick, PLLC
1615 M St. NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

jlove@kellogghansen.com
202-326-7900
Party name: Tax Law Professors
Sharon E. Pandak
    Counsel of Record
Greehan, Taves, & Pandak PLLC
4004 Genesee Place
Suite 201
Woodbridge, VA 22192

spandak@gtpslaw.com
(703) 680-5543
Party name: International Municipal Lawyers Association