No. 17-900
Title:Crane Co., Petitioner
v.
Jeanette G. Poage
Docketed:December 22, 2017
Linked with 17A470
Lower Ct:Court of Appeals of Missouri, Eastern District
   Case Numbers:(ED103953)
   Decision Date:May 2, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:August 22, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 26 2017Application (17A470) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 20, 2017 to December 20, 2017, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Oct 26 2017Application (17A470) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until December 20, 2017.
Dec 20 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2018)
AppendixCertificate of Word CountPetitionProof of Service
Dec 28 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 19, 2018 to February 19, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 29 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 20, 2018

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Neal Kumar Katyal
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
555 Thirteenth St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20004

neal.katyal@hoganlovells.com
202 637 5528
Party name: Crane Co.
Attorneys for Respondent
Robert Wayne Cowan
    Counsel of Record
Bailey Peavy Bailey Cowan Heckaman PLLC
5555 San Felipe Street
Suite 900
Houston, TX 77056

rcowan@bpblaw.com
7134257100
Party name: Jeanette Poage