No. 17-8995
Title:Jason J. Mont, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 18, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3732)
   Decision Date:February 15, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 15 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 18, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixAppendixProof of Service
Jun 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from June 18, 2018 to July 18, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jun 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 18, 2018.
Jul 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 18, 2018 to August 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including August 17, 2018.
Aug 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from August 17, 2018 to September 17, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Aug 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including September 17, 2018.
Sep 17 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 01 2018Reply of petitioner Jason Mont filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Oct 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Nov 02 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
Dec 17 2018Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 17 2018Brief of petitioner Jason Mont filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Dec 21 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT for Tuesday, February 26, 2019.
Jan 11 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Jan 11 2019Record from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit is available both on PACER and electronic.
Jan 15 2019CIRCULATED
Jan 16 2019Brief of respondent United States filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 14 2019Reply of petitioner Jason Mont filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 26 2019Argued. For petitioner: Vanessa F. Malone, Akron, Ohio. For respondent: Jenny Ellickson, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Vanessa Malone
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender
50 South Main St.
Suite 700
Akron, OH 44308

vanessa_malone@fd.org
330-375-5739
Party name: Jason Mont
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States