No. 17-887
Title:Richard Brown, Warden, Petitioner
v.
Dentrell Brown
Docketed:December 21, 2017
Linked with 17A386
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1014)
   Decision Date:February 1, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:July 19, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 05 2017Application (17A386) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 17, 2017 to December 16, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Oct 10 2017Application (17A386) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 16, 2017.
Dec 18 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2018 to February 21, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 22 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 21, 2018

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
Indiana Government Center South, Fifth Floor
302 W. Washington Street
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: Richard Brown, Warden, Wabash Valley Correctional Facility
Attorneys for Respondent
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3220
Party name: Dentrell Brown