No. 17-886
Title:Arnold Fleck, Petitioner
v.
Joe Wetch, et al.
Docketed:December 21, 2017
Linked with 17A494
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1564)
   Decision Date:August 17, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 02 2017Application (17A494) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 15, 2017 to January 14, 2018, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Nov 06 2017Application (17A494) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until December 15, 2017.
Dec 15 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 22, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 22, 2018 to February 21, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 21, 2018, for all respondents.
Jan 22 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Pacific Legal Foundation.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 22 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Kourosh Kenneth Hamidi, et al.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Feb 16 2018Waiver of right of respondent Joe Wetch, Aubrey Fiebelkorn-Zuger, and Tony Weiler to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 12 2018Response Requested. (Due April 11, 2018)
Mar 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 11, 2018 to May 10, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 20 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 10, 2018, for all respondents.
Apr 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 10, 2018 to June 8, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 8, 2018, for all respondents.
Jun 08 2018Brief of respondents Joe Wetch, Aubrey Fiebelkorn-Zuger, and Tony Weiler in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 08 2018Brief of respondent Penny Miller, Secretary-Treasurer of the State Board of Law Examiners in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 22 2018Reply of petitioner Arnold Fleck filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Nov 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Nov 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018.
Nov 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Dec 03 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Pacific Legal Foundation GRANTED.
Dec 03 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Kourosh Kenneth Hamidi, et al. GRANTED.
Dec 03 2018Petition GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Janus v. State, County, and Municipal Employees, 585 U. S. ___ (2018).

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Timothy Mason Sandefur
    Counsel of Record
Goldwater Institute Scharf-Norton Center for Constitutional Litigation
500 E. Coronado Road
Phoenix, AZ 85004

tsandefur@goldwaterinstitute.org
6024625000
Party name: Arnold Fleck
Attorneys for Respondents
Randall Joseph Bakke
    Counsel of Record
Bakke Grinolds & Wiederholt
300 West Century Avenue, P.O. Box 4247
Bismarck, ND 58502-4247

rbakke@bgwattorneys.com
701-751-8188
Party name: Joe Wetch, Aubrey Fiebelkorn-Zuger, and Tony Weiler
Matthew Arnold Sagsveen
    Counsel of Record
North Dakota Office of Attorney General
Office of Attorney General
500 N. 9th St.
Bismarck, ND 58501-4509

masagsve@nd.gov
701-328-3640
Party name: Penny Miller, Secretary-Treasurer of the State Board of Law Examiners
Other
Deborah Joyce La Fetra
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
930 G Street
Sacramento, CA 95814

DLaFetra@pacificlegal.org
(916) 419-7111
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation
William James Young
    Counsel of Record
c/o National Right to Work Legal Defense Foundation, Inc.
8001 Braddock Road, Suite 600
Springfield, VA 22160

wjy@nrtw.org
(703) 321-8510
Party name: Kourosh Kenneth Hamidi, et al.