No. 17-8830
Title:Ronald W. Paul, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 8, 2018
Linked with 17A968
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-5329)
   Decision Date:December 11, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 06 2018Application (17A968) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 11, 2018 to May 4, 2018, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/Opinions
Mar 14 2018Application (17A968) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until May 4, 2018.
May 04 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 7, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of ServiceAppendix
Jun 06 2018Memorandum of respondent United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jun 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jun 26 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2019.
Oct 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/18/2019.
Oct 28 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/1/2019.
Nov 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/8/2019.
Nov 12 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/15/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Isaiah Skip Gant
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
810 Broadway
Suite 200
Nashville, TN 37203

Skip_gant@fd.org
615-736-5047
Party name: Ronald Paul
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States