No. 17-878
Title:Kimberly McLaughlin, Petitioner
v.
Suzan McLaughlin
Docketed:December 19, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Arizona
   Case Numbers:(CV-16-0266-PR)
   Decision Date:September 19, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 18 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 18, 2018)
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServicePetitionAppendixOther
Jan 18 2018Brief of respondent Suzan McLaughlin in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2018Reply of petitioner Kimberly McLaughlin filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Keith Allen Berkshire
    Counsel of Record
Berkshire Law Office, PLLC
5050 N. 40th Street, Suite 340
Phoenix, AZ 85018

keith@berkshirelawoffice.com
6023967668
Party name: Kimberly McLaughlin
Attorneys for Respondent
Douglas Harry Hallward-Driemeier
    Counsel of Record
Ropes & Gray, LLP
2099 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20006-6807

Douglas.Hallward-Driemeier@ropesgray.com
202-508-4776
Party name: Suzan McLaughlin