No. 17-872 | |
Title: | Bruce Walker, Petitioner v. Estate of Ryan L. Clark |
Docketed: | December 18, 2017 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (16-3560, 16-3644) |
Decision Date: | July 26, 2017 |
Rehearing Denied: | September 20, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Dec 15 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 17, 2018) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 11 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 17, 2018 to February 16, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
Main DocumentProof of Service | |
Jan 18 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 16, 2018. |
Feb 14 2018 | Brief of respondent Estate of Ryan L. Clark in opposition filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 27 2018 | Reply of petitioner Bruce Walker filed. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Feb 28 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018. |
Mar 19 2018 | Petition DENIED. |
Jan 17 2018 | Motion of Estate of Ryan L. Clark for an extension of time not accepted for filing. (January 18, 2018) |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioner | ||
Andrew Alston Jones Counsel of Record | Husch Blackwell LLP 555 East Wells Street, Suite 1900 Milwaukee, WI 53202 Andrew.Jones@huschblackwell.com | (414) 978-5445 |
Party name: Bruce Walker | ||
Attorneys for Respondent | ||
Jeff Scott Olson Counsel of Record | The Jeff Scott Olson Law Firm, S. C. 131 West Wilson Street Suite 1200 Madison, WI 53703 jsolson@scofflaw.com | 608-283-6001 |
Party name: Estate of Ryan L. Clark |