No. 17-869
Title:Melissa Davenport, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of Sandy Springs, Georgia
Docketed:December 15, 2017
Linked with 17A501
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-15499)
   Decision Date:August 23, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 03 2017Application (17A501) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 21, 2017 to December 15, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Nov 09 2017Application (17A501) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until December 15, 2017.
Dec 15 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 16, 2018)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 16, 2018 to February 15, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 15, 2018.
Jan 16 2018Brief amici curiae of DKT Liberty Project and Reason Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 16 2018Brief amici curiae of Restoring Religious Freedom Project, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 15 2018Brief of City of Sandy Springs, Georgia in opposition submitted.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
David Thomas Goldberg
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

dgoldberg@law.stanford.edu
6504988229
Party name: Melissa Davenport, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Scott D. Bergthold
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Scott D. Bergthold, P.L.L.C.
2290 Ogletree Ave.
Suite 106
Chattanooga, TN 37421

sbergthold@sdblawfirm.com
4238993025
Party name: City of Sandy Springs, Georgia
Other
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Avenue NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

JAmunson@jenner.com
202-639-6023
Party name: DKT Liberty Project and Reason Foundation
Sarah M. Shalf
    Counsel of Record
Emory University School of Law
Supreme Court Advocacy Project
1301 Clifton Road NE
Atlanta, GA 30322-2770

sarah.shalf@emory.edu
404-712-4652
Party name: Restoring Religious Freedom Project, et al.