No. 17-862
Title:Maricopa County, Arizona, et al., Petitioners
v.
Manuela Villa
Docketed:December 15, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-15460)
   Decision Date:August 2, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:September 14, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 13 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 16, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 16, 2018 to February 14, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 14, 2018.
Jan 16 2018Brief amici curiae of Arizona Voice for Crime Victims, Inc. and the Association of Deputy District Attorneys filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 13 2018Waiver of right of respondent Manuela Villa to respond filed.
Feb 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Feb 26 2018Response Requested. (Due March 28, 2018)
Mar 27 2018Brief of respondent Manuela Villa in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 09 2018Reply of petitioners Maricopa County, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Michael A. Carvin
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

macarvin@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: Maricopa County, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Cameron Alan Morgan
    Counsel of Record
Sole Practitioner
4356 N. Civic Center Plaza
Scottsdale, AZ 85251

camerona.morgan@hotmail.com
480-990-9507
Party name: Manuela Villa
Other
Blaine H. Evanson
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
333 South Grand Avenue
Los Angeles, CA 90071

bevanson@gibsondunn.com
9494513805
Party name: Arizona Voice for Crime Victims, Inc. and the Association of Deputy District Attorneys