No. 17-85
Title:Dan Carmichael McCarthan, Petitioner
v.
Joseph C. Collins, Chief United States Probation Officer for the Middle District of Florida
Docketed:July 17, 2017
Linked with 16A1158
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(12-14989)
   Decision Date:March 14, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 23 2017Application (16A1158) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 12, 2017 to July 12, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
May 25 2017Application (16A1158) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 12, 2017.
Jul 12 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 16, 2017)
Aug 02 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Dan C.McCarthan on 08/11/2017
Aug 10 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 15, 2017.
Aug 16 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Constitution Project filed.
Aug 25 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 16, 2017.
Oct 05 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 30, 2017.
Oct 30 2017Brief of respondent Joseph C. Collins, Chief United States Probation Officer for the Middle District of Florida in opposition filed.
Nov 14 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.
Nov 14 2017Reply of petitioner Dan C.McCarthan filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Kannon K. Shanmugam
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly, LLP
725 Twelfth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005-5901

kshanmugam@wc.com
202-434-5000
Party name: Dan C.McCarthan
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: Joseph C. Collins, Chief United States Probation Officer for the Middle District of Florida
Other
Rakesh Nageswar Kilaru
    Counsel of Record
Wilkinson Walsh & Eskovitz, LLP
1900 M St. NW, Suite 800
Washington, DC 20036

rkilaru@wilkinsonwalsh.com
202-847-4000
Party name: The Constitution Project