No. 17-834
Title:Kansas, Petitioner
v.
Ramiro Garcia
Docketed:December 11, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Kansas
   Case Numbers:(112,502)
   Decision Date:September 8, 2017
Rule 12.4
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 07 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 10, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, State of Kansas
Blanket Consent
Jan 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 10, 2018 to February 9, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 9, 2018.
Jan 10 2018Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2018Brief amici curiae of Michigan, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 9, 2018 to March 12, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 12, 2018.
Mar 12 2018Brief of respondents Ramiro Garcia, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 23 2018Reply of petitioner State of Kansas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 28 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Dec 04 2018Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Dec 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Dec 19 2018Supplemental brief of respondents Ramiro Garcia, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 26 2018Rescheduled.
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 10 2019Rescheduled.
Jan 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Jan 17 2019Rescheduled.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Mar 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 18 2019Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition and the following question: Whether the Immigration Reform and Control Act impliedly preempts Kansas’s prosecution of respondents.
Apr 09 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Apr 16 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, State of Kansas
Blanket Consent
Apr 29 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits is granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 24, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 23, 2019.
May 24 2019Brief of petitioner State of Kansas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 24 2019Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 31 2019Brief amici curiae of State of Indiana and Eleven Other States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
May 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of Immigration Reform Law Institute filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2019Brief amicus curiae of Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 01 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, October 16, 2019.
Jul 11 2019Motion for a further extension of time to file respondent's brief on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jul 12 2019Motion for a further extension of time to file respondent's brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including August 6, 2019.
Aug 01 2019CIRCULATED
Aug 06 2019Brief of respondents Ramiro Garcia, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 12 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 13 2019Brief amici curiae of Puente Arizona et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Brief amici curiae of Immigration, Labor and Employment Law Scholars filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 13 2019Brief amicus curiae of Law Office of David J. Grummon, P.A. filed. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Aug 13 2019Brief amici curiae of The National Immigration Law Center, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Aug 16 2019Record requested from the Supreme Court of Kansas.
Aug 26 2019Record received from the Supreme Court of Kansas. (1 Box)
Sep 05 2019Reply of petitioner State of Kansas filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 11 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Oct 16 2019Argued. For petitioner: Derek Schmidt, Attorney General, Topeka, Kan.; and Christopher G. Michel, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C (for United States, as amicus curiae.) For respondent: Paul Hughes, Washington, D. C.
Nov 12 2019Records received from the Appellate Courts of Kansas, companion cases State v. Donaldo Morales, and State v. Guadalupe Ochoa-Lara. (1 envelope). A thumb drive is also included with the record, that I have filed electronically.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Toby Crouse
    Counsel of Record
Office of Attorney General Derek Schmidt
120 S.W. 10th Avenue
2nd Floor
Topeka, KS 66612

toby.crouse@ag.ks.gov
785-296-2215
Party name: State of Kansas
Derek L. Schmidt120 SW 10th Avenue, 2nd Floor
Topeka, KS 66612

derek.schmidt@ag.ks.gov
785-296-2215
Party name: Kansas
Attorneys for Respondent
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY
500 North Capitol Street, NW
The McDermott Building
Washington, DC 20001

PHughes@mwe.com
(202) 756-8981
Party name: Ramiro Garcia, et al.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Lawrence J. Joseph
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Lawrence J. Joseph
1250 Connecticut Avenue
Suite 200
Washington, DC 20036

ljoseph@larryjoseph.com
202-355-9452
Party name: Eagle Forum Education & Legal Defense Fund
Aaron David Lindstrom
    Counsel of Record
Michigan Department of Attorney General
P.O. Box 30212
525 West Ottawa Street, 7th Floor
Lansing, MI 48909

lindstroma@michigan.gov
517-241-8403
Party name: Michigan, et al.
Trisha B. Anderson
    Counsel of Record
Covington & Burling LLP
850 10th Street NW
Washington, DC 20001

tanderson@cov.com
2026626000
Party name: Immigration, Labor and Employment Law Scholars
Thomas M. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Indiana Attorney General
IGC South, Fifth Floor
302 W. Washington
Indianapolis, IN 46204

tom.fisher@atg.in.gov
317-232-6255
Party name: State of Indiana and Eleven Other States
Matthew James Ginsburg
    Counsel of Record
American Fed. of Labor and Congress of Industrial
815 16th St., N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

mginsburg@aflcio.org
202-637-5397
Party name: American Federation of Labor and Congress of Industrial Organizations
Christopher J. Hajec
    Counsel of Record
Immigration Reform Law Institute
25 Massachusetts Avenue NW, Suite 335
Washington, DC 20001

chajec@irli.org
202-232-5590
Party name: Immigration Reform Law Institute
Anne Lai
    Counsel of Record
UC Irvine School of Law Immigrant Rights Clinic
P.O. Box 5479
Irvine, CA 92616-5479

alai@law.uci.edu
(949) 824-9894
Party name: Puente Arizona et al.
Caryn Cecelia Lederer
    Counsel of Record
Hughes Socol Piers Resnick & Dym, LTD.
70 W. Madison St. Suite 4000
Chicago, IL 60602

clederer@hsplegal.com
312-580-0100
Party name: The National Immigration Law Center, The Southern Poverty Law Center and 28 Additional Organizations
Brian Lowell Leininger
    Counsel of Record
Leininger Law Offices
8826 Santa Fe Drive
Suite 214
Overland Park, KS 66212

brian@leininger-law.com
9136386194
Party name: Law Office of David J. Grummon
Kathleen Marie Sullivan
    Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Ave., 22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010

kathleensullivan@quinnemanuel.com
(212) 849-7000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America