No. 17-830
Title:Phil Lamont Trent, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 11, 2017
Linked with 17A352
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3960)
   Decision Date:July 13, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 28 2017Application (17A352) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 11, 2017 to December 8, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Sep 29 2017Application (17A352) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until December 8, 2017.
Dec 08 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 10, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 10, 2018 to February 9, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 9, 2018.
Feb 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 9, 2018 to March 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 22, 2018.
Mar 22 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 10 2018Reply of petitioner Phil Lamont Trent filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 24 2018Rescheduled.
Apr 24 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 09 2018Rescheduled.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Paul Whitfield Hughes
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street NW
Washington, DC 20006

PHughes@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3000
Party name: Phil Lamont Trent
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States