No. 17-818
Title:Branden Huertas, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 7, 2017
Linked with 17A378
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-4014)
   Decision Date:July 24, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 05 2017Application (17A378) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 22, 2017 to December 7, 2017, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Oct 06 2017Application (17A378) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until December 7, 2017.
Dec 06 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 8, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 8, 2018 to February 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 7, 2018.
Jan 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 7, 2018 to March 9, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 12 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including March 9, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael B. Kimberly
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

mkimberly@mayerbrown.com
(202) 263-3127
Party name: Branden Huertas
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States