No. 17-8153
Title:Michael Edward Moore, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:March 19, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-5584)
   Decision Date:December 14, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 14 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 18, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixProof of Service
Apr 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 18, 2018 to May 18, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 11 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 18, 2018.
May 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 18, 2018 to June 18, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including June 18, 2018.
Jun 18 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jul 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Dec 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Laura E. Davis
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Services of Eastern TN, Inc.
800 South Gay Street
Suite 2400
Knoxville, TN 37929

Laura_Davis@fd.org
(865) 637-7979
Party name: Michael Edward Moore
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States