No. 17-8151 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Russell Bucklew, Petitioner
v.
Anne L. Precythe, Director, Missouri Department of Corrections, et al.
Docketed:March 15, 2018
Linked with 17A911
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-3052)
   Decision Date:March 6, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:March 15, 2018
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 15 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due April 16, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 15 2018Application (17A911) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Main Document
Mar 16 2018Brief of respondents Anne Precythe, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Mar 19 2018Reply of petitioner Russell Bucklew filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 20 2018Application (17A911) referred to the Court.
Mar 20 2018Application (17A911) granted by the Court. The application for stay of execution of sentence of death presented to Justice Gorsuch and by him referred to the Court is granted pending the disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the sending down of the judgment of this Court. The Chief Justice, Justice Thomas, Justice Alito, and Justice Gorsuch would deny the application for stay of execution.
Mar 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 06 2018Brief amici curiae of The American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 30 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. In addition to the questions presented in the petition, the parties are directed to brief and argue the following Question: Whether petitioner met his burden under Glossip v. Gross, 576 U. S. ____ (2015), to prove what procedures would be used to administer his proposed alternative method of execution, the severity and duration of pain likely to be produced, and how they compare to the State's method of execution.
May 08 2018Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
May 16 2018Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including July 16, 2018.
Jun 26 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Russell Bucklew
Blanket Consent
Jul 06 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Anne Precythe, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jul 16 2018Brief of petitioner Russell Bucklew filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 16 2018Petitioner's Unopposed Motion to File Joint Appendix -- Volume III Under Seal of Russell Bucklew not accepted for filing. (Amended motion submitted.) (August 15, 2018)
Jul 16 2018Joint appendix (2 volumes) filed. (Statement of costs filed)
Main DocumentMain Document
Jul 20 2018Brief amici curiae of The American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of American Medical Association in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of Megan McCracken and Jennifer Moreno filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of Pharmacy, Medicine, and Health Policy Experts filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of Association for Accessible Medicines in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2018Brief amicus curiae of Former Judges and Prosecutors filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2018Brief amici curiae of Scholars and Academics of Constitutional Law filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 23 2018Brief amici curiae of Former Corrections Officials filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2018Brief of respondent Anne Precythe, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 15 2018Motion to file Volume III of the joint appendix under seal with redacted copy of transcript for public record filed by petitioner Russell Bucklew.
Main DocumentOtherProof of Service
Aug 20 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, November 6, 2018
Aug 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Aug 22 2018Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, Alabama, Arizona, Arkansas, Colorado, Florida, Georgia, Idaho, Indiana, Kansas, Louisiana, Mississippi, Nebraska, South Carolina, Tennessee, Utah, Wyoming filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2018Brief amici curiae of Arizona Voice for Crime Victims, Inc., and Melissa Sanders filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 06 2018Lodging proposal of petitioner filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Sep 10 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit.
Sep 10 2018Opposition of respondent to lodging proposal of petitioner filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Sep 12 2018CIRCULATED
Sep 14 2018Reply of petitioner Russell Bucklew filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 19 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit. The record is complete. (1 Box).
Oct 01 2018Motion to file Volume III of the joint appendix under seal with redacted copy of transcript for public record GRANTED.
Oct 19 2018Motion to appoint counsel filed by petitioner Russell Bucklew.
Main Document
Oct 31 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018.
Nov 06 2018Argued. For petitioner: Robert Hochman, Chicago, Ill. For respondents: D. John Sauer, State Solicitor, Jefferson City, Mo.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Robert N. Hochman
    Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin, LLP
One South Dearborn Street
Chicago, IL 60603

rhochman@sidley.com
312-853-2936
Party name: Russell Bucklew
Attorneys for Respondents
D. John Sauer
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Supreme Court Building, 207 West High Street
P.O. Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102

john.sauer@ago.mo.gov
573-751-3321
Party name: Anne Precythe, et al.
Michael Joseph SpillanePO Box 899
Jefferson City, MO 65102

mike.spillane@ago.mo.gov
(573) 751-1307
Party name: Anne Precythe, et al.
Other
Ginger D. Anders
    Counsel of Record
Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP
1155 F Street NW
7th Floor
Washington, DC 20004

ginger.anders@mto.com
2022201107
Party name: Megan McCracken and Jennifer Moreno
Brian Timothy Burgess
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
901 New York Avenue
Washington, DC 20001

BBurgess@goodwinlaw.com
2023464000
Party name: Association for Accessible Medicines
David D. ColeAmerican Civil Liberties Union Foundation
915 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

dcole@aclu.org
212-549-2611
Party name: The American Civil Liberties Union, et al.
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5886
Party name: Pharmacy, Medicine, and Health Policy Experts
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
2100 McKinney Avenue
Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75201

aho@gibsondunn.com
214-698-3233
Party name: Arizona Voice for Crime Victims, Inc., and Melissa Sanders
John Robert Mills
    Counsel of Record
Phillips Black, Inc.
836 Harrison Street
San Francisco, CA 94107

j.mills@phillipsblack.org
888-532-0897
Party name: Former Judges and Prosecutors
Leonard A. Nelson
    Counsel of Record
American Medical Association
330 N. Wabash Ave.
Suite 39300
Chicago, IL 60611

leonard.nelson@ama-assn.org
3124645532
Party name: American Medical Association
Bruce H. Schneider
    Counsel of Record
Stroock & Stroock & Lavan LLP
180 Maiden Lane
New York, NY 10038

bschneider@stroock.com
(212) 806-5400
Party name: Scholars and Academics of Constitutional Law
Tejinder Singh
    Counsel of Record
Goldstein & Russel, P.C.
7475 Wisconsin Avenue
Suite 850
Bethesda, MD 20814

tsingh@goldsteinrussell.com
202.362.0636
Party name: Former Corrections Officials
Cassandra Stubbs
    Counsel of Record
ACLU Capital Punishment Project
201 W. Main Street
Suite 402
Durham, NC 27701

cstubbs@aclu.org
919-688-4605
Party name: The American Civil Liberties Union, et al.