No. 17-804
Title:EVE-USA, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Mentor Graphics Corporation
Docketed:December 4, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2015-1470, 2015-1554, 2015-1556)
   Decision Date:March 16, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:September 1, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 30 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due January 3, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 12 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, EVE-USA, Inc., et al.
Blanket Consent
Dec 13 2017Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Mentor Graphics Corporation.
Blanket Consent
Jan 02 2018Brief amicus curiae of Intellectual Property Law Scholar filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 02 2018Brief amici curiae of Eighteen Intellectual Property Law Professors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2018Brief amici curiae of HP Inc., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2018Waiver of right of respondent Mentor Graphics Corporation to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 03 2018Brief amici curiae of Law Professors and Public Knowledge filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jan 10 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Jan 17 2018Response Requested. (Due February 16, 2018)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
E. Joshua Rosenkranz
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
51 West 52nd Street
New York, NY 10019

jrosenkranz@orrick.com
(212) 506-5380
Party name: EVE-USA, Inc., et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Mark E. Miller
    Counsel of Record
O'Melveny & Myers LLP
Two Embarcadero Center
28th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94lll

markmiller@omm.com
415 984 8904
Party name: Mentor Graphics Corporation
Other
Eric Edwin Bensen
    Counsel of Record
47 Hilton Ave.
Garden City, NY 11530

ericbensen@me.com
516-486-2250
Party name: Intellectual Property Law Scholar
Bernard H. Chao
    Counsel of Record
University of Denver
Sturm College of Law
2255 E. Evans Avenue
Denver, CO 80208

bchao@law.du.edu
303-871-6110
Party name: Eighteen Intellectual Property Law Professors
Phillip Robert Malone
    Counsel of Record
Juelsgaard Intellectual Property and Innovation Clinic
Mills Legal Clinic at Stanford Law School
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

pmalone@law.stanford.edu
650-725-6369
Party name: Law Professors and Public Knowledge
Courtney Gilligan Saleski
    Counsel of Record
DLA Piper LLP
1650 Market Street
Suite 4900
Philadelphia, PA 19103

courtney.saleski@dlapiper.com
215-656-2431
Party name: HP Inc., et al.