No. 17-8
Vide 16-1320
Title:Town of Vernon, New York, Petitioner
v.
United States, et al.
Docketed:June 27, 2017
Linked with 16A982
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-1688, 15-1726)
   Decision Date:November 9, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:January 27, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 13 2017Application (16A982) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 27, 2017 to May 26, 2017, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
Apr 17 2017Application (16A982) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until May 26, 2017.
May 10 2017Application (16A982) to extend further the time from May 26, 2017 to June 26, 2017, submitted to Justice Ginsburg.
May 15 2017Application (16A982) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until June 26, 2017.
Jun 23 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 27, 2017)
Jul 19 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, The Town of Vernon on 08/10/2017
Jul 21 2017Brief amicus curiae of Citizens Equal Rights Foundation filed.
Jul 24 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 28, 2017.
Aug 28 2017Brief of respondents United States, et al. in opposition filed.
Sep 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Oct 03 2017Rescheduled.
Oct 10 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017.
Oct 11 2017Rescheduled.
Oct 23 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.
Oct 24 2017Rescheduled.
Oct 30 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/3/2017.
Nov 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2017.
Nov 13 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/21/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Frank W. Kowalkowski
    Counsel of Record
Von Briesen & Roper, S.C.
414 East Walnut Street, Suite 280
Green Bay, WI 54301

fkowalkowski@vonbriesen.com
(920) 232-4848
Party name: Town of Vernon, New York
Attorneys for Respondents
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States, et al.
Other
James J. Devine Jr.128 Main Street
Oneida, NY 13421

JDevine@centralny.twcbc.com
(315) 363-6600
Party name: Citizens Equal Rights Foundation