No. 17-781
Title:Kenneth M. Asboth, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Wisconsin
Docketed:November 28, 2017
Linked with 17A311
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Wisconsin
   Case Numbers:(2015AP2052-CR)
   Decision Date:July 6, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 19 2017Application (17A311) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 4, 2017 to November 20, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Sep 20 2017Application (17A311) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 20, 2017.
Nov 20 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 28, 2017)
PetitionCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 28 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 28, 2017 to February 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Nov 30 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including February 5, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Mark T. Stancil
    Counsel of Record
Robbins, Russell, Englert, Orseck, Untereiner & Sauber LLP
1801 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

mstancil@robbinsrussell.com
(202) 775-4500
Party name: Kenneth M. Asboth, Jr.
Attorneys for Respondent
Misha Tseytlin
    Counsel of Record
Wisconsin Dept. of Justice
17 W. Main Street
Madison, WI 53703

tseytlinm@doj.state.wi.us
(608) 267-9323
Party name: State of Wisconsin