No. 17-779
Title:Jason Parker, Petitioner
v.
Montgomery County Correctional Facility, et al.
Docketed:November 28, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-3449)
   Decision Date:September 26, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 27 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 28, 2017)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2017Waiver of right of respondent Montgomery County Correctional Facility & County of Montgomery to respond filed.
Main Document
Dec 22 2017Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 27 2017Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Jan 04 2018Response Requested. (Due February 5, 2018)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Pratik Arvind Shah
    Counsel of Record
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld, LLP
1333 New Hampshire Ave., NW
Washington, DC 02109

pshah@akingump.com
202-887-4210
Party name: Jason Parker
Attorneys for Respondents
Philip William Newcomer
    Counsel of Record
Montgomery County Solicitor's Office
One Montgomery Plaza, Suite 800
P.O. Box 311
Norristown, PA 19404-0311

pnewcome@montcopa.org
610-278-3033
Party name: Montgomery County Correctional Facility & County of Montgomery
Other
Clifford Warren Berlow
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
353 North Clark Street
Chicago, IL 60654

cberlow@jenner.com
312-840-7366
Party name: The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center