No. 17-778
Title:Jamar Alonzo Quarles, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 28, 2017
Linked with 17A296
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1690)
   Decision Date:March 10, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:June 28, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 13 2017Application (17A296) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 26, 2017 to November 24, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Sep 15 2017Application (17A296) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 24, 2017.
Nov 24 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 28, 2017)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 19 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 28, 2017 to January 29, 2017, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 20 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 29, 2018.
Dec 28 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 17 2018Motion of United States of America for an extension of time submitted.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jeremy Charles Marwell
    Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW, Suite 500W
Washington, DC 20037

jmarwell@velaw.com
202-639-6507
Party name: Jamar Quarles
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States of America
Other
Thomas Mark Bondy
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

tbondy@orrick.com
202-339-8400
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers