No. 17-772
Title:Brent Nicholson, et al., Petitioners
v.
Thrifty Payless, Inc., et al.
Docketed:November 27, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-35180, 15-35242)
   Decision Date:June 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 25, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 22 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 27, 2017)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 27, 2017 to January 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 12 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 26, 2018
Jan 25 2018Brief of respondents Thrifty Payless, Inc., and Rite Aid Corporation in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 12 2018Reply of petitioners Brent Nicholson, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Taryn Marie Darling
    Counsel of Record
Impact Law Group, PLLC
1325 4th Avenue, Suite 1400
Seattle, WA 98101

taryn@impactlawgroup.com
2067925230
Party name: Brent Nicholson, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Delbert Dwight Miller
    Counsel of Record
Van Kampen & Crowe PLLC
1001 Fourth Avenue, Suite 4050
Seattle, WA 98154

dmiller@vkclaw.com
206-386-7353
Party name: Thrifty Payless, Inc., and Rite Aid Corporation