No. 17-771 Vide 17-752 | |
Title: | Wyeth LLC, et al., Petitioners v. Rite Aid Corporation, et al. |
Docketed: | November 27, 2017 |
Lower Ct: | United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit |
Case Numbers: | (15-1184, 15-1185, 15-1186, 15-1187, 15-1274, 15-1323, 15-1342) |
Decision Date: | August 21, 2017 |
Date | Proceedings and Orders |
Nov 20 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 27, 2017) |
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Dec 04 2017 | Waiver of right of respondents Rochester Drug Co-operative, Inc. to respond filed. |
Dec 13 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Professional Drug Company, Inc. to respond filed. |
Main Document | |
Dec 22 2017 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, et al. |
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | |
Jan 10 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018. |
Feb 20 2018 | Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America, et al. GRANTED. |
Feb 20 2018 | Petition DENIED. |
NAME | ADDRESS | PHONE |
Attorneys for Petitioners | ||
Jay Philip Lefkowitz Counsel of Record | Kirkland & Ellis LLP 601 Lexington Avenue New York, NY 10022 lefkowitz@kirkland.com | +12124464970 |
Party name: Wyeth LLC, et al. | ||
Attorneys for Respondents | ||
Peter Kohn Counsel of Record | Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP 101 Greenwood Ave. Suite 600 Jenkintown, PA 19046 | 215-277-5770 |
Party name: Rochester Drug Co-operative, Inc. | ||
Thomas M. Sobol Counsel of Record | Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro, LLP 55 Cambridge Parkway Suite 301 Cambridge, MA 02142 tom@hbsslaw.com | 6174823700 |
Party name: Professional Drug Company, Inc. | ||
Other | ||
David William Ogden Counsel of Record | Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr, LLP 1875 Pennsylvania Ave., NW Washington, DC 20006 david.ogden@wilmerhale.com | 202-663-6000 |
Party name: Pharmaceutical Research and Manufacturers of America and the American Tort Reform Association |