No. 17-770
Title:ICTSI Oregon, Inc., Petitioner
v.
International Longshore and Warehouse Union, et al.
Docketed:November 27, 2017
Linked with 17A388
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-35504)
   Decision Date:July 24, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 05 2017Application (17A388) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 22, 2017 to November 22, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Oct 12 2017Application (17A388) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until November 22, 2017.
Nov 22 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 27, 2017)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 27, 2017 to January 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 18 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 26, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Michael Thomas Garone
    Counsel of Record
Schwabe, Williamson & Wyatt, P.C.
1211 SW Fifth Ave., Suites 1600-1900
Portland, OR 97204-3795

mgarone@schwabe.com
503-222-9981
Party name: ICTSI Oregon, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
1717 Main Street
Suite 3200
Dallas, TX 75201

allyson.ho@morganlewis.com
2144664000
Party name: Pacific Maritime Association