No. 17-766
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Jason Daniel Sims
Docketed:November 24, 2017
Linked with 17A447
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1233)
   Decision Date:April 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 3, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 20 2017Application (17A447) granted by Justice Gorsuch extending the time to file until December 1, 2017.
Oct 20 2017Application (17A447) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 1, 2017 to December 1, 2017, submitted to Justice Gorsuch.
Nov 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 26, 2017)
PetitionProof of Service
Dec 18 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 26, 2017 to January 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 22 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 25, 2018.
Jan 19 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 25, 2018 to February 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 25 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 26, 2018.
Feb 23 2018Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Jason Sims.
Main Document
Feb 23 2018Brief of respondent Jason Sims in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 07 2018Reply of petitioner United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Apr 23 2018Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 17-765 is granted. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Apr 23 2018Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 17-765. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 17-765. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the flings is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
Jul 09 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT On Tuesday, October 9, 2018. VIDED.
Aug 03 2018CIRCULATED
Aug 07 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit.
Aug 14 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. 8th Circuit. 1 Envelope.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Chris Tarver
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Office
1401 W. Capitol, Suite 490
Little Rock, AR 72201

chris_tarver@fd.org
5013246113
Party name: Jason Sims
Jeffrey L. FisherStanford Law School Supreme Court Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
6507247081
Party name: Jason Sims