No. 17-765
Title:United States, Petitioner
v.
Victor J. Stitt, II
Docketed:November 24, 2017
Linked with 17A287
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-6158)
   Decision Date:June 27, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 12 2017Application (17A287) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 25, 2017 to October 25, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Sep 13 2017Application (17A287) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until October 25, 2017.
Oct 13 2017Application (17A287) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 24, 2017.
Oct 13 2017Application (17A287) to extend further the time from October 25, 2017 to November 24, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Nov 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 26, 2017)
PetitionProof of Service
Dec 14 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 26, 2017 to January 25, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 19 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 25, 2018.
Jan 25 2018Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Victor Stitt, II.
Main Document
Jan 25 2018Brief of respondent Victor Stitt, II in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 13 2018Reply of petitioner United States filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Feb 23 2018Letter of petitioner United States filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Feb 26 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Apr 23 2018Petition GRANTED. The petition for a writ of certiorari in No. 17-766 is granted. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument.
Apr 23 2018Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 17-765. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 17-765. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the flings is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
May 07 2018Motion for appointment of counsel filed by respondent Jason Sims (in No. 17-766). (Corrected motion to be submitted 5/29/18).
May 07 2018Motion for appointment of counsel filed by respondent Jason Daniel Sims (in No. 17-766). (Corrected motion received 6/4/18).
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 09 2018Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
May 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file the opening briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to an including June 26, 2018. The time to file respondents' briefs on the merits is extended to and including August 14, 2018.
May 31 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner United States. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Jun 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jun 26 2018Brief of petitioner United States filed. VIDED.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Jul 09 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT On Tuesday, October 9, 2018. VIDED.
Aug 03 2018CIRCULATED
Aug 06 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED. VIDED.
Aug 07 2018Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 6th Circuit.
Aug 07 2018Record received from the U.S.C.A. 6 Circuit. The record is electronic.
Aug 14 2018Brief of respondent Victor Stitt, II filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Jason Daniel Sims
Blanket Consent
Aug 14 2018Brief of respondent Jason Daniel Sims (in 17-766) filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 15 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Victor Stitt, II
Blanket Consent
Aug 16 2018Joint motion for divided argument filed by respondents. VIDED.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2018Amicus brief of The National Association of Federal Defenders not accepted for filing. (Brief to be reprinted - August 24, 2018)
Aug 21 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Federal Defenders filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Main DocumentOtherProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Sep 13 2018Reply of petitioner United States filed. VIDED. (Distributed)
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Sep 24 2018Joint motion for divided argument filed by respondents DENIED.
Sep 24 2018Motion to appoint counsel filed by respondent Jason D. Sims GRANTED, and Jeffrey L. Fisher, of Stanford, California, is appointed to serve as counsel for respondent in No. 17-766.
Sep 26 2018Record received from the U.S.D.C. Eastern Dist. of Tennessee is electronic and located on PACER with the exception of SEALED documents that are electronic.
Oct 04 2018Letter of respondent filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Oct 09 2018Argued. For petitioner: Erica Ross, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. For respondents: Jeffrey L. Fisher, Menlo Park, Cal. (Appointed by this Court.) VIDED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey L. Fisher
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

jlfisher@law.stanford.edu
(650) 724-7081
Party name: Jason Daniel Sims
Timothy Carl Ivey
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender, N.D. of Ohio
1660 West Second Street, Suite 750
Cleveland, OH 44113

timothy_ivey@fd.org
216-522-4856
Party name: Victor Stitt, II
Other
David John Debold
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
1050 Connecticut Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

ddebold@gibsondunn.com
2029558551
Party name: The National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Michael Clark Holley
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
810 Broadway, Suite 200
Nashville, TN 37203

Michael_holley@fd.org
615-736-5047
Party name: National Association of Federal Defenders