No. 17-7517
Title:Michael Smith, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 23, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1730)
   Decision Date:December 13, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 17 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 22, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of ServiceAppendix
Feb 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 22, 2018 to March 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 26, 2018.
Mar 06 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Mar 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William H Theis
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Program
55 E. Monroe St. Suite 2800
Chicago, IL 60603

william_theis@fd.org
312.621.8300
Party name: Michael Smith
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States