No. 17-7505 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Vernon Madison, Petitioner
v.
Alabama
Docketed:January 19, 2018
Linked with 17A770
Lower Ct:Circuit Court of Alabama, Mobile County
   Case Numbers:(CC-1985-001385.80)
   Decision Date:January 16, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jan 18 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 20, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServiceOther
Jan 19 2018Brief of respondent State of Alabama in opposition filed.
Main Document
Jan 22 2018Application (17A770) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 22 2018Response to application from respondent State of Alabama filed.
Jan 22 2018Reply of petitioner Vernon Madison filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jan 25 2018UPON CONSIDERATION of the application of counsel for the applicant, IT IS ORDERED that execution of the sentence of death is hereby stayed pending further order of Justice Thomas or of the Court.
Jan 25 2018Application (17A770) referred to the Court.
Jan 25 2018Application (17A770) granted by the Court. The application for stay of execution of sentence of death presented to Justice Thomas and by him referred to the Court is granted pending the disposition of the petition for a writ of certiorari. Should the petition for a writ of certiorari be denied, this stay shall terminate automatically. In the event the petition for a writ of certiorari is granted, the stay shall terminate upon the issuance of the mandate of this Court. Justice Thomas, Justice Alito, and Justice Gorsuch would deny the application.
Feb 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 26 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED.
Mar 15 2018Joint motion for an extension of time file the briefs on the merits.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 27 2018Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 22, 2018. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 31, 2018.
May 10 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner Vernon Madison.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 18 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Alabama
Blanket Consent
May 21 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Vernon Madison
Blanket ConsentProof of Service
May 22 2018Brief of petitioner Vernon Madison filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 29 2018Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioner GRANTED.
May 29 2018Brief amici curiae of American Psychological Association and American Psychiatric Association filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 09 2018SET FOR ARGUMENT On Tuesday, October 2, 2018
Jul 31 2018Brief of respondent State of Alabama filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 03 2018CIRCULATED
Aug 07 2018Record requested from the Circuit Court of Alabama, Mobile County.
Aug 07 2018Brief amici curiae of States of Texas, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 07 2018Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Police Organizations filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 14 2018Record received from the Court of Criminal Appeals State of Alabama. The record is electronic.
Aug 16 2018Record received from the Circuit Court of Alabama, Mobile County. The record is electronic.
Aug 17 2018Record received from the Circuit Court of Alabama, Mobile County. 1 envelope.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Bryan A. Stevenson
    Counsel of Record
122 Commerce Street
Montgomery, AL 36104

(334) 269-1803
Party name: Vernon Madison
Angela Leigh SetzerEqual Justice Initiative
122 Commerce Street
Montgomery, AL 36104

asetzer@eji.org
3342691803
Party name: Vernon Madison
Attorneys for Respondent
Steven Troy Marshall
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

mnewman@ago.state.al.us
3342427300
Party name: State of Alabama
Andrew L. Brasher501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36130

abrasher@ago.state.al.us
334 353 2609
Party name: Alabama
James Roy HoutsOffice of the Alabama Attorney General
Office of the Attorney General
P.O. Box 3000152
Montgomery, AL 36130-0152

jhouts@ago.state.al.us
3343531513
Party name: State of Alabama
Other
Thomas Ryan McCarthy
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park, PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard
Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

tom@consovoymccarthy.com
7032439423
Party name: NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF POLICE ORGANIZATIONS
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Solicitor General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: State of Texas, et al.
David William Ogden
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering
1875 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

david.ogden@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: American Psychological Association and American Psychiatric Association