No. 17-749
Vide 17-721, 17-788
Title:Lowell T. Johnson, Petitioner
Robert Lee Stinson
Docketed:November 21, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(13-3343, 13-3346, 13-3347)
   Decision Date:August 18, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 15 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 21, 2017)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 10 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Jan 18 2018Response Requested. (Due February 20, 2018)
Feb 20 2018Brief of respondent Robert Stinson in opposition filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 02 2018Reply of petitioners Lowell T. Johnson and Raymond D. Rawson filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.

Attorneys for Petitioner
Jason John Franckowiak
    Counsel of Record
Otjen, Gendelman, Zitzer, Johnson & Weir, S.C.
20935 Swenson Drive, Suite 310
Waukesha, WI 53186
Party name: Lowell T. Johnson
Attorneys for Respondent
Michael Kanovitz
    Counsel of Record
311 N. Arberdeen Street, 3rd Floor
Chicago, IL 60607
Party name: Robert Stinson