No. 17-747
Title:Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Petitioner
v.
Stephen Wendell, et al.
Docketed:November 20, 2017
Linked with 17A376
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-16321)
   Decision Date:June 2, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:July 21, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 04 2017Application (17A376) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 19, 2017 to November 20, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Oct 05 2017Application (17A376) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until November 20, 2017.
Nov 20 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 20, 2017)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 08 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 20, 2017 to January 19, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 14 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 19, 2018.
Dec 18 2017Brief of respondent GlaxoSmithKline LLC in support filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentMain Document
Dec 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 19, 2018 to February 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 08 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 2, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
William McGinley Jay
    Counsel of Record
Goodwin Procter, LLP
901 New York Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

WJay@goodwinlaw.com
2023464190
Party name: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondents
Alan Jay Lazarus
    Counsel of Record
Drinker, Biddle & Reath, LLP
50 Fremont Street, 20th Fl.
San Francisco, CA 94105-2235

alan.lazarus@dbr.com
(415) 591-7500
Party name: GlaxoSmithKline LLC
Matthew W.H. Wessler
    Counsel of Record
Gupta Wessler PLLC
1900 L Street, NW
Suite 312
Washington, DC 20036

matt@guptawessler.com
2028881741
Party name: Stephen Wendell, et al.
Other
John H. Beisner
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20005

john.beisner@skadden.com
202-371-7000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Jerrold Joseph Ganzfried
    Counsel of Record
Ganzfried Law
5335 Wisconsin Avenue, NW Suite 440
Washington, DC 20015

JJG@ganzfriedlaw.com
202-486-2004
Party name: DRI-The Voice of the Defense Bar