No. 17-742
Title:Mary Anne Sause, Petitioner
v.
Timothy J. Bauer, et al.
Docketed:November 20, 2017
Linked with 17A252
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-3231)
   Decision Date:June 20, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 31 2017Application (17A252) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 18, 2017 to October 18, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Sep 06 2017Application (17A252) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until October 18, 2017.
Sep 22 2017Application (17A252) to extend further the time from October 18, 2017 to November 17, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor.
Sep 25 2017Application (17A252) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until November 17, 2017.
Nov 17 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 20, 2017)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 22 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Mary Anne Sause
Blanket Consent
Dec 08 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 20, 2017 to January 19, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 14 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 19, 2018.
Dec 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of State of Texas filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of Former Federal Prosecutors filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 19 2018Brief of respondents Timothy J. Bauer, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 06 2018Reply of petitioner Mary Anne Sause filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Feb 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/23/2018.
Feb 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Mar 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Apr 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian Edward Robison
    Counsel of Record
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher
2100 McKinney Ave, Suite 1100
Dallas, TX 75201

BRobison@gibsondunn.com
214-698-3370
Party name: Mary Anne Sause
Attorneys for Respondents
David R. Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Fisher, Patterson, et al.
3550 S.W. 5th Street
Topeka, KS 66606

dcooper@fisherpatterson.com
785-232-7761
Party name: Timothy J. Bauer, et al.
Other
Allyson Ho
    Counsel of Record
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
1717 Main Street, Suite 3200
Dallas, TX 75201

allyson.ho@morganlewis.com
214-466-4000
Party name: Former Federal Prosecutors
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Solicitor General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: State of Texas