No. 17-736
Title:Blatt, Hasenmiller, Leibsker & Moore LLC, Petitioner
v.
Ronald Oliva
Docketed:November 16, 2017
Linked with 17A339
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Seventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2516)
   Decision Date:July 24, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 22 2017Application (17A339) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from October 22, 2017 to November 21, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan.
Sep 26 2017Application (17A339) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until November 21, 2017.
Nov 15 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 18, 2017)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 15 2017Brief amicus curiae of Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 18 2017Brief amici curiae of NARCA – The National Creditors Bar Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Jan 08 2018Response Requested. (Due February 7, 2018)

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Joshua G. Vincent
    Counsel of Record
Hinshaw & Culbertson, LLP
222 North LaSalle Street
Suite 300
Chicago, IL 60601

jvincent@hinshawlaw.com
312-704-3463
Party name: Blatt, Hasenmiller, Leibsker & Moore, LLC
Attorneys for Respondent
Mohammed O. Badwan
    Counsel of Record
Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.
2500 S. Highland Avenue, Suite 200
Lombard, IL 60148

mbadwan@sulaimanlaw.com
312-313-1613
Party name: Ronald Oliva
Other
Benjamin L. Hatch
    Counsel of Record
McGuireWoods LLP
2001 K Street NW
Suite 400
Washington, DC 20006-1040

bhatch@mcguirewoods.com
202 857 1727
Party name: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Manuel Harry Newburger
    Counsel of Record
Barron & Newburger, PC
7320 MoPac Expressway
Suite 400
Austin, TX 78731

mnewburger@bn-lawyers.com
512-476-9103
Party name: NARCA – The National Creditors Bar Association, et al.