No. 17-7224
Title:Robert Eugene Secord, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:January 2, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-1477)
   Decision Date:September 21, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 19 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due February 1, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Jan 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 1, 2018 to March 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 24 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 5, 2018.
Feb 26 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 5, 2018 to April 4, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Feb 27 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including April 4, 2018.
Apr 04 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Apr 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
Dec 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jasna Tosic
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
50 Louis Ave.
Suite 300
Grand Rapids, MI 49503

jasna_tosic@fd.org
616-742-7420
Party name: Robert Secord
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States