No. 17-7177
Title:Manuel de Jesus Gordillo-Escandon, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 20, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-4481)
   Decision Date:December 13, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 14 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 19, 2018)
Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisPetitionProof of Service
Dec 27 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
Main Document
Jan 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Jan 09 2018Response Requested. (Due February 8, 2018)
Jan 30 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from February 8, 2018 to March 12, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 31 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including March 12, 2018.
Mar 12 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Certificate of Word CountMain Document
Mar 15 2018Reply of petitioner Manuel de Jesus Gordillo-Escandon filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Howard Walton Anderson III
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Howard W. Anderson III, LLC
PO Box 661
176 E. Main St.
Pendleton, SC 29670

howard@hwalawfirm.com
864-643-5790
Party name: Manuel de Jesus Gordillo-Escandon
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States