No. 17-7140
Title:Kelvin Pace, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 20, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-16427, 16-16429)
   Decision Date:September 29, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 18 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 19, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServiceOther
Jan 09 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 19, 2018 to February 20, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 10 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 20, 2018.
Feb 20 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 28 2018Reply of petitioner Kelvin Pace filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 07 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Kelvin Pace filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 20 2018Second supplemental brief of petitioner Kelvin Pace filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brenda Greenberg Bryn
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
One East Broward Boulevard
Suite 1100
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

brenda_bryn@fd.org
954356-7436
Party name: Kelvin Pace
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States