No. 17-71
Vide 17-74
Title:Weyerhaeuser Company, Petitioner
v.
United States Fish and Wildlife Service, et al.
Docketed:July 13, 2017
Linked with 16A916
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-31008)
   Decision Date:June 30, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:February 13, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 21 2017Application (16A916) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 14, 2017 to June 29, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Mar 27 2017Application (16A916) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until June 29, 2017.
Jun 06 2017Application (16A916) to extend further the time from June 29, 2017 to July 13, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Jun 09 2017Application (16A916) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 13, 2017.
Jul 11 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 14, 2017)
Jul 18 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support either party or of neither party, received from counsel for petitioner.
Jul 20 2017Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs, in support of either party or of neither party, received from counsel for respondent Markle Interests, LLC.
Jul 26 2017Waiver of right of respondents Markle Interests, LLC; P & F Lumber Co., 2000, LLC; & PF Monroe Properties, LLC to respond filed.
Aug 04 2017Blanket Consent filed by respondent- intervenors, Center for Biological Diversity and Gulf Restoration Network on 08/10/2017 VIDED
Aug 09 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 13, 2017, for all respondents
Aug 09 2017Brief amicus curiae of St. Tammany Parish filed. VIDED.
Aug 11 2017Brief amicus curiae of Mountain States Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Aug 14 2017Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed. VIDED.
Aug 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed. VIDED.
Aug 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of Energy and Wildlife Action Coalition filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed. VIDED.
Aug 14 2017Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Home Builders, et al. filed. VIDED.
Aug 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of San Jaun County, Utah filed. VIDED.
Aug 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed. VIDED.
Aug 14 2017Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed. VIDED.
Aug 14 2017Brief amici curiae of The American Farm Bureau Federation, et al. filed.
Aug 14 2017Brief amici curiae of Alabama and 17 Additional States filed. VIDED.
Sep 07 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including October 13, 2017.
Oct 06 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including November 13, 2017, for all respondents.
Nov 13 2017Brief of respondents Fish and Wildlife Service, et al. in opposition filed. VIDED.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Nov 13 2017Brief of intervenor-respondents Center for Biological Diversity and Gulf Restoration Network in opposition filed. VIDED
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Nov 29 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Nov 29 2017Reply of petitioner Weyerhaeuser Co. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Jan 22 2018Petition GRANTED.
Jan 29 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jan 29 2018Motion for an extension of time filed.
Main Document
Jan 30 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Weyerhaeuser Company.
Blanket Consent
Jan 30 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Intervenor-respondents Center for Biological Diversity and Gulf Restoration Network
Blanket Consent
Feb 01 2018Blanket Consent filed by Respondents, Markle Interests, LLC, et al..
Blanket Consent
Feb 02 2018Motion to extend the time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including April 23, 2018.
Apr 23 2018Brief of petitioner Weyerhaeuser Company filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 23 2018Joint appendix filed (statement of cost filed).
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 23 2018Brief of respondents Markle Interests, LLC, et al. in support of petitioner filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 26 2018Brief amici curiae of Coalition for a Sustainable Delta, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of St. Tammany Parish Government filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountOther
Apr 27 2018Brief amicus curiae of Southeastern Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2018Brief amici curiae of Wyoming Stock Growers Association, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of Energy and Wildlife Action Coalition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2018Brief amici curiae of American Exploration & Production Council, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Washington Legal Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 30 2018Brief amici curiae of National Conference of State Legislatures, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of The Cato Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of San Jaun County, Utah filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2018Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Home Builders, et al. filed.
Proof of ServiceCertificate of Word CountMain Document
Apr 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Building Industry Legal Defense Foundation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Brief of Alabama and 19 Additional States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2018Brief amici curiae of National Federation of Independent Business, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2018Brief amicus curiae of Cause of Action Institute filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Apr 30 2018Brief amici curiae of The American Farm Bureau Federation, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 02 2018Motion for an extension of time to file respondents' briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
May 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file respondents' briefs on the merits granted and the time is extended to and including June 29, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Timothy S. Bishop
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
71 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

tbishop@mayerbrown.com
312-701-7829
Party name: Weyerhaeuser Company
Attorneys for Respondents
John Thorvald Buse
    Counsel of Record
Center for Biological Diversity
1212 Broadway, Suite 800
Oakland, CA 94612

jbuse@biologicaldiversity.org
510-844-7125
Party name: Intervenor-respondents Center for Biological Diversity and Gulf Restoration Network
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States Fish and Wildlife Service, et al.
Mark Miller
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
8645 N. Military Trail
Suite 511
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

mm@pacificlegal.org
561-691-5000
Party name: Markle Interests, LLC, et al.
Other
Paul J. Beard II
    Counsel of Record
Alston & Bird LLP
1121 L Street, Suite 700
Sacramento, CA 95814

paul.beard@alston.com
9164983354
Party name: Building Industry Legal Defense Foundation, et al.
Svend Arnold Brandt-Erichsen
    Counsel of Record
Nossaman, LLP
601 Union Street, Suite 5305
Seattle, WA 98101

sbrandterichsen@nossaman.com
(206) 395-7632
Party name: Energy and Wildlife Action Coalition
Andrew L. Brasher
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of Alabama
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36130

abrasher@ago.state.al.us
(334) 242-7300
Party name: Alabama and 17 Additional States
Karen Budd-Falen
    Counsel of Record
Budd-Falen Law Offices, LLC
300 East 18th Street, Post Office Box 346
Cheyenne, WY 82003-0346

karen@buddfalen.com
3076325105
Party name: Wyoming Stock Growers Association et al.
Louis A. Chaiten
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
901 Lakeside Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44114

lachaiten@jonesday.com
216-586-7244
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Theodore Hadzi-Antich
    Counsel of Record
Texas Public Policy Foundation
901 Congress Avenue
Austin, TX 78701

tha@texaspolicy.com
512-472-2700
Party name: National Federation of Independent Business, et al
Kimberly Stewart Hermann
    Counsel of Record
Southeastern Legal Foundation
2255 Sewell Mill Road, Suite 320
Marietta, GA 30062

khermann@southeasternlegal.org
770-977-2131
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation
Tyson Clinton Kade
    Counsel of Record
Van Ness Feldman, LLP
1050 Thomas Jefferson Street, NW, Seventh Floor
Washington, DC 20007

tck@vnf.com
202-298-1800
Party name: The American Farm Bureau Federation, et al.
Steven Troy Marshall
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
501 Washington Avenue
Montgomery, AL 36104

mnewman@ago.state.al.us
3342427300
Party name: Alabama and 19 Additional States
Daniel J. O'Hanlon
    Counsel of Record
Kronick Moskovitz Tiedemann & Girard
400 Capitol Mall
27th Floor
Sacramento, CA 95814

dohanlon@kmtg.com
916 321-4500
Party name: Coalition for a Sustainable Delta, et al.
William Perry Pendley
    Counsel of Record
Mountain States Legal Foundation
2596 S. Lewis Way
Lakewood, CO 80227

wppendley@mountainstateslegal.com
303-292-2021
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation
Richard A. Samp
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., N.W.
Washington, DC 20036-0000

rsamp@wlf.org
202-588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation, et al.
Ilya Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
The Cato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

Ishapiro@cato.org
(202)-842-0200
Party name: The Cato Institute
Bernard Seymour Smith
    Counsel of Record
St. Tammany Parish Government
21454 Koop Dr., Suite 2 G
Mandeville, LA 70471

bssmith@stpgov.org
985-898-3427
Party name: St. Tammany Parish
Aaron Michael Streett
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002

aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
(713)-229-1234
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Andrew Jacob Turner
    Counsel of Record
Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20037

aturner@huntonak.com
202-955-1658
Party name: American Exploration & Production Council, et al.
John Julian Vecchione
    Counsel of Record
Cause of Action Institute
1875 Eye Street, N.W., Suite 800
Washington, DC 20006

john.vecchione@causeofaction.org
2026037372
Party name: Cause of Action Institute
Thomas Jon Ward
    Counsel of Record
National Association of Home Builders
1201 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

202-266-8200
Party name: The National Association of Home Builders, et al.
Bryan Kipp Weir
    Counsel of Record
Consovoy McCarthy Park PLLC
3033 Wilson Boulevard, Suite 700
Arlington, VA 22201

bryan@consovoymccarthy.com
2027255032
Party name: National Conference of State Legislatures, et al.
Shawn Terry Welch
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Hart, LLP
222 South Main Street, Suite 2200
Salt Lake City, UT 84101

stwelch@hollandhart.com
801-799-5800
Party name: San Jaun County, Utah
John C. EastmanCenter for Const'l Jurisprudence
c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman University
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

jeastman@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Steven James LechnerSteven J. Lechner
9830 Xavier Court
Westminster, CO 80031

steven.j.lechner@gmail.com
(720) 936-8363
Party name: Mountain States Legal Foundation
John Joseph Park Jr.Strickland Brockington Lewis, LLP
1170 Peachtree Street NE
Suite 2200
Atlanta, GA 30309

jjp@sbllaw.net
(678)-347-2208
Party name: Southeastern Legal Foundation