No. 17-6991
Title:Rubin Dexter Baxter, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:December 6, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-17756)
   Decision Date:September 5, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 04 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due January 5, 2018)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of ServiceOther
Dec 26 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 5, 2018 to February 5, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 27 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including February 5, 2018.
Feb 05 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 15 2018Reply of petitioner Rubin Baxter filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Jan 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Vanessa Louise Chen
    Counsel of Record
Federal Public Defender's Office
150 West Flagler Street
Suite 1700
Miami, FL 33130

vanessa_chen@fd.org
305-536-6900
Party name: Rubin Baxter
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States