No. 17-696
Title:Alexis Gonzalez-Badillo, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 9, 2017
Linked with 17A207
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-40418)
   Decision Date:June 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Aug 21 2017Application (17A207) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from September 13, 2017 to November 12, 2017, submitted to Justice Alito.
Aug 23 2017Application (17A207) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until November 13, 2017.
Nov 09 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due December 11, 2017)
Dec 11 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 11, 2017 to January 10, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 12 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 10, 2018.
Jan 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 10, 2018 to February 9, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jan 05 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including February 9, 2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Amir H. Ali
    Counsel of Record
Roderick & Solange
MacArthur Justice Center
718 7th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

amir.ali@macarthurjustice.org
(202) 869-3434
Party name: Alexis Gonzalez-Badillo
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States