No. 17-6891 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Tremane Wood, Petitioner
v.
Oklahoma
Docketed:November 29, 2017
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Oklahoma
   Case Numbers:(PCD-2017-653)
   Decision Date:August 28, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 27 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 29, 2017)
PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
Dec 21 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 29, 2017 to January 28, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Dec 27 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 29, 2018.
Jan 29 2018Brief of respondent State Of Oklahoma in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 12 2018Reply of petitioner Tremane Wood filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Feb 27 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 13 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 20 2018Rescheduled.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Mar 27 2018Rescheduled.
Apr 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 10 2018Rescheduled.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 18 2018Rescheduled.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
Apr 27 2018Rescheduled.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 09 2018Rescheduled.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.
May 21 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 23 2018Rescheduled.
May 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
May 31 2018Rescheduled.
Jun 04 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 06 2018Rescheduled.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 13 2018Rescheduled.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 19 2018Rescheduled.
Sep 06 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 11 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 01 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018.
Oct 01 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/12/2018.
Oct 09 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/26/2018.
Oct 22 2018Rescheduled.
Oct 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/2/2018.
Oct 29 2018Rescheduled.
Nov 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2018.
Nov 05 2018Rescheduled.
Nov 13 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/16/2018.
Nov 13 2018Rescheduled.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Jessica Lynn Felker
    Counsel of Record
Office of Federal Public Defender, District of Arizona
850 W. Adams St. #201
Phoenix, AZ 85007

Jessica_Felker@fd.org
602-382-2772
Party name: Tremane Wood
Attorneys for Respondent
Jennifer L. Crabb
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
313 N.E. 21st Street
Oklahoma City, OK 73105

fhc.docket@oag.ok.gov
405-521-3921
Party name: State Of Oklahoma