No. 17-6877
Title:Terrance Robinson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:November 27, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-12432)
   Decision Date:September 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Nov 20 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due December 27, 2017)
PetitionAppendixMotion for Leave to Proceed in Forma PauperisProof of Service
Dec 19 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response from December 27, 2017 to January 26, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Dec 20 2017Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 26, 2018.
Jan 26 2018Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Feb 07 2018Reply of petitioner Terrance Robinson filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Feb 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Mar 12 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/16/2018.
Mar 19 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/23/2018.
Mar 26 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2018.
Apr 09 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/20/2018.
Apr 23 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/27/2018.
May 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018.
May 14 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Whitman Matthew Dodge
    Counsel of Record
Federal Defender Program Inc.
101 Marietta Street N.W.
Suite 1500
Atlanta, GA 30303

Matthew_Dodge@FD.org
4046887530
Party name: Terrance Robinson
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States